EP0368931 - VALVED CATHETER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/21] | VALVED CATHETER DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
[1993/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TARGET THERAPEUTICS, INC. 47900 Bayside Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states TARGET THERAPEUTICS, INC. 47201 Lakeview Boulevard, P.O. Box 5120 Fremont, CA 94537-5120 / US | ||
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states TARGET THERAPEUTICS 130 Rio Robles P.O. Box 610458 San Jose California 95161 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGELSON, Erik, T. 2383 Greer Road Palo Alta, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
DANIELS, John, R. 842 LaCasas Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/09] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/21] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88907872.1 | 04.08.1988 | [1990/21] | WO1988US02656 | Priority number, date | US19870083624 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: US 83624 | US19880226674 | 01.08.1988 Original published format: US 226674 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901352 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368931 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368931 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
A61M25/0075 (EP);
A61M25/0125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | KATHETER MIT VENTIL | [1993/41] | English: | VALVED CATHETER DEVICE | [1993/41] | French: | CATHETER A VALVE | [1993/41] |
Former [1990/21] | KATHETER MIT VENTIL SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | ||
Former [1990/21] | VALVED CATHETER DEVICE AND METHOD | ||
Former [1990/21] | CATHETER A VALVE, ET PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1989 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3408809 (SCHUBERT WERNER); | [A]US4646742 (PACKARD BRIAN M [US], et al) | International search | [X]US3402717 (DOHERTY GEORGE O) |