EP0327643 - PROTECTIVE HOOD AND ORAL-NASAL MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROOKMAN, Michael J 8271 S.W. 41st Street Davie, FL 33328 / US | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1989/33] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908471.1 | 02.08.1988 | [1989/33] | WO1988US02588 | Priority number, date | US19870081834 | 05.08.1987 Original published format: US 81834 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900873 | Date: | 09.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327643 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327643 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A62B17/04, A62B7/10, A62B18/10, A62B19/00, A62B18/08, A62B18/02, A62B23/02, B63C11/02 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
A62B18/025 (EP);
A62B17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | SCHUTZHAUBE UND ORAL-NASAL-MASKE | [1989/33] | English: | PROTECTIVE HOOD AND ORAL-NASAL MASK | [1989/33] | French: | CAGOULE DE PROTECTION ET MASQUE DESTINE A COUVRIR LE NEZ ET LA BOUCHE | [1989/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.1989 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1989 | Search fee paid | 04.04.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.1994 | BE | 19.10.1994 | CH | 19.10.1994 | FR | 19.10.1994 | IT | 19.10.1994 | LI | 19.10.1994 | NL | 19.10.1994 | SE | 19.01.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
FR | 17.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
FR | 17.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/17] | CH | 19.10.1994 | |
LI | 19.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1929343 (ANGELO BELLONI); | [A]GB897531 (KIDDE WALTER CO LTD, et al); | [A]EP0086871 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) | International search | [Y]US2821192 ; | [Y]US3381454 (KURT SPONSEL); | [Y]US4559939 (LEVINE HAROLD H [US], et al) |