EP0381686 - ADJUSTABLE ROD END [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 14000 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1990/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Raymond, M. 1539 Circle Lane Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | 02 /
BUSHEY, John, A. 9000 Riley Lake Road Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 03 /
DETTMANN, Thomas, A. 24530 Cedar Point Road New Prague, MN 56071 / US | 04 /
ANDERSON, Mark, D. Route 1, Box 132 Atwater, MN 56209 / US | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908582.5 | 30.08.1988 | [1990/33] | WO1988US03024 | Priority number, date | US19870100170 | 23.09.1987 Original published format: US 100170 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8902990 | Date: | 06.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381686 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381686 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16C23/04 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
F16C11/0614 (EP,US);
F16C11/106 (EP,US);
F16C25/02 (EP,US);
F16C11/0647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/33] | Title | German: | REGELBARES STANGENENDSTÜCK | [1990/33] | English: | ADJUSTABLE ROD END | [1990/33] | French: | EXTREMITE DE TIGE REGLABLE | [1990/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.1990 | Search fee paid | 21.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.05.1995 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1671859 (GUNDELACH HENRY N); | [A]US2836470 (SHEPPARD RICHARD H); | [A]US2473096 (WILSON HAMILL WILLIAM, et al); | [A]GB1207298 (UNITED DIESEL AB [SE]); | [A]US3130989 (LANNEN ROBERT J) | International search | [A]US3597025 (RINGEL REGINALD K); | [A]US4335924 (MCCLOSKEY ALBERT R); | [A]US4615638 (ITO EIICHI [DE]); | [A]US4632575 (ALVERTH RONALD W [US], et al) |