EP0426665 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/20] | PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS | ||
[1993/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, David, R. 307 Meeting House Lane Merion Station, PA 19066 / US | 02 /
LEE, Mark, S. 8965C Early April Way Columbia, MD 21046 / US | 03 /
DECKER, Richard, W. 10 Holmehurst Avenue Baltimore, MD 21228 / US | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908896.9 | 02.09.1988 | [1991/20] | WO1988US03102 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9003100 | Date: | 22.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426665 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426665 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46, H05K3/40, H05K3/20 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
H05K1/112 (EP);
H05K3/205 (EP);
H05K3/46 (KR);
H05K3/4614 (EP);
H05K3/4647 (EP);
H05K3/4658 (EP);
H05K2201/0367 (EP);
H05K2201/0394 (EP);
H05K2201/09472 (EP);
H05K2201/09563 (EP);
H05K2203/0152 (EP);
H05K2203/061 (EP);
H05K2203/063 (EP);
H05K2203/0726 (EP);
H05K2203/0733 (EP);
H05K3/243 (EP);
H05K3/28 (EP);
H05K3/4007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEITERPLATTEN | [1993/43] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS | [1993/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION DE CARTES DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES | [1993/43] |
Former [1991/20] | LEITERPLATTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEITERPLATTEN | ||
Former [1991/20] | PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARDS | ||
Former [1991/20] | CARTES DE CIRCUITS IMPRIMES ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Request for further processing for: | 26.07.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 27.10.1993 | [1994/32] | Cited in | International search | US3913223 [ ] (GIGOUX CLAUDE); | US3953924 [ ] (ZACHRY CLYDE L, et al); | US3181986 [ ] (NATHAN PRITIKIN); | US4769309 [ ] (KING DAVID R [US], et al) | [X] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, volume 11, no. 12, May 1969, (New York, US), K.F. Greene: "Producing printed circuit boards", pages 1676-1677 | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, volume 20, no. 9, February 1978, (New York, US), J.G. Cutillo et al.: "High resolution circuitization process", pages 3389-3390 |