EP0342240 - METHOD OF CORRECTING FIGURE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKI, Masaki 3-15-2-406, Takaido-nishi Suginami-ku Tokyo 168 / JP | 02 /
TAKEGAHARA, Takashi 256-2, Nishiterakata-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-01 / JP | 03 /
KAJITANI, Akira, FANUC Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1991/29] |
Former [1989/47] | 01 /
SEKI, Masaki 3-15-2-406, Takaido-nishi Suginami-ku Tokyo 168 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEGAHARA, Takashi 256-2, Nishiterakata-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-01 / JP | |||
03 /
KAJITANI, Akira Fanuc Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Representative(s) | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Overbury, Richard Douglas, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 88909126.0 | 19.10.1988 | [1989/47] | WO1988JP01058 | Priority number, date | JP19870265052 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: JP 26505287 | [1989/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904011 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342240 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342240 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
G05B19/40933 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36073 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36077 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36325 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/47] | G05B19/403 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1989/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES BILDELEMENTES | [1989/47] | English: | METHOD OF CORRECTING FIGURE ELEMENT | [1989/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE CORRECTION D'UN ELEMENT D'IMAGE | [1989/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1989 | Translation filed | 05.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1989 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.10.1996 | [1997/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4328550 (WEBER JOHN M); | [Y]EP0217048 (IBM [US]) | International search | [A]JPS61250706 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS62121511 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | Examination | EP0332712 |