EP0333845 - CONTINUOUSLY ROTATING PLATFORM WITH MULTIPLE MOUNTED DOUBLE CLIPPERS FOR CONTINUOUSLY FORMING LINK PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELAWARE CAPITAL FORMATION INC. 1100 North Market Street Suite 780 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states DELAWARE CAPITAL FORMATION INC. 1100 North Market Street Suite 780 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Alfred, J. 433 Millbrook Road Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Grant, K. 111 Hollow Oak Court Cary, NC 27513 / US | 03 /
MAY, Dennis, J. P.O. Box 63 Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US | 04 /
BRINSON, Edward, P. 3317 Joanne Drive Raleigh, NC 27603 / US | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 88909142.7 | 30.09.1988 | [1989/39] | WO1988US03402 | Priority number, date | US19870105665 | 07.10.1987 Original published format: US 105665 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903346 | Date: | 20.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0333845 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333845 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/15, B65B51/05 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
A22C11/108 (EP);
B65B51/04 (EP,US);
B65B9/15 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53787 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICH UMLAUFENDE PLATTFORM MIT MEHREREN DOPPEL-KLAMMEREINRICHTUNGEN ZUR BILDUNG EINER KETTE VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [1989/39] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY ROTATING PLATFORM WITH MULTIPLE MOUNTED DOUBLE CLIPPERS FOR CONTINUOUSLY FORMING LINK PRODUCT | [1989/39] | French: | PLATE-FORME ROTATIVE EN CONTINU AVEC DOUBLE AGRAFEUSE MULTIPLE POUR FORMER UNE CHAINE DE PRODUITS | [1993/38] |
Former [1989/39] | PLATE-FORME ROTATIVE EN CONTINU AVEC DOUBLE AGRAFEUSE MULTIPLE | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1989 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Request for further processing for: | 15.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.09.1993 | IT | 22.09.1993 | LI | 22.09.1993 | SE | 22.09.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 22.09.1993 | |
IT | 22.09.1993 | ||
LI | 22.09.1993 | ||
SE | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | CH | 22.09.1993 | |
LI | 22.09.1993 | ||
SE | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 22.09.1993 | |
LI | 22.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0139333 [ ] (DEVRO INC [US]) | International search | [A]US4305240 (GREVICH JOHN J, et al); | [A]US4578928 (ANDRE L GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US4249364 (KAWASAKI KAORU [JP], et al); | [A]US4189897 (AILEY HARRISON A JR [US], et al); | [A]US4109363 (VELARDE CLYDE R); | [A]US3783583 (DOBBERT A) |