EP0383807 - EXERCISE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPORTSQUIP LIMITED 41 Central Chambers Dame Court IE-Dublin 2 / IE | [1993/36] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states BERGMAN, Alan 35 Sloane Gardens London SW1 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergman, Alan 35 Sloane Gardens London SW1 / GB | [1993/35] |
Former [1990/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88909331.6 | 26.10.1988 | [1990/35] | WO1988GB00900 | Priority number, date | GB19870025016 | 26.10.1987 Original published format: GB 8725016 | GB19870026552 | 12.11.1987 Original published format: GB 8726552 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903708 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383807 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383807 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/04 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
A63B21/0004 (EP);
A63B21/023 (EP);
A63B23/0488 (EP);
A63B21/00061 (EP);
A63B21/00065 (EP);
A63B21/00069 (EP);
A63B21/0023 (EP);
A63B21/0428 (EP);
A63B21/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSGERÄT | [1990/35] | English: | EXERCISE DEVICE | [1990/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXERCICE | [1990/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.12.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4466610 [ ] (ISRAEL TERRY P [US]); | FR2087415 [ ] (JULIAN JACQUELINE) |