EP0386048 - BLOOD PURIFICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3i RESEARCH EXPLOITATION LIMITED 91 Waterloo Road London SE1 8XP / GB | [1990/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENWOOD, Roger, Newton Garden Flat 155 Goldhurst Terrace South Hampstead London NW6 3EU / GB | 02 /
ALDRIDGE, Colin 14 Epping Way North Chingford London E4 7PB / GB | 03 /
TATTERSALL, James, Erskine 1 Bruce Hall Mews Franciscan Road London SW17 8DF / GB | 04 /
BARRETT, Rodney, Valentine 18 Fernbank Road Redland Bristol BS6 6PZ / GB | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | March, Gary Clifford, et al Batchellor, Kirk & Co. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 88909333.2 | 21.10.1988 | [1990/37] | WO1988GB00920 | Priority number, date | GB19870024914 | 23.10.1987 Original published format: GB 8724914 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903696 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386048 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386048 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/30, A61M1/34 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
A61M1/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/303 (EP,US);
A61M1/308 (EP,US);
A61M1/3434 (EP,US);
A61M1/3437 (EP,US);
A61M1/3604 (EP,US);
A61M60/258 (EP,US);
A61M60/37 (EP,US);
A61M60/427 (EP,US);
A61M60/432 (EP,US);
A61M60/515 (EP,US);
A61M60/538 (EP,US);
A61M1/1698 (EP,US);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
A61M5/1486 (EP,US);
A61M60/113 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | BLUTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1990/37] | English: | BLOOD PURIFICATION APPARATUS | [1990/37] | French: | APPPAREIL D'EPURATION DU SANG | [1990/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.1994 | BE | 21.09.1994 | NL | 21.09.1994 | LU | 31.10.1994 | SE | 21.12.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/35] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
BE | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
BE | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 21.09.1994 | Cited in | International search | US4331540 [ ] (WITSOE DAVID A); | EP0105845 [ ] (HAEMOTRONIC SRL [IT]); | EP0114698 [ ] (LYSAGHT MICHAEL J [US], et al); | EP0132210 [ ] (RHONE POULENC SA [FR]) | [X] - A.S.A.I.O. Transactions, volume 33, no. 3, September 1987, (Hagerstown, MD, US), R.R. Stromberg et al.: "Development of a novel membrane apheresis system for plasma collection at mobile sites", pages 614-620 | Examination | - A. S. A. I. O. Transactions, volume 33, no. 3, September 1987, ( Hagerstown, MD, US), R. R. Stromberg et al.: "Development of a novel membrane apheresis system for plasma collection at mobile sites", pages 614 - 620 see page 614, column 2, lines 8 - 28; page 615, figure 1; page 617, column 1, line 28 - coulmn 2, line 12; page 618, figure 5, column 1, lines 1 - 9 |