EP0408555 - METHOD OF PRODUCIND AN OBLONG PLANT TROUGH WITH END WALLS AND APPARATUS FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/04] | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING AN OBLONG PLANT TROUGH WITH END WALLS AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
[1993/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Q. TRAY LIMITED 2 Irish Place Gibraltar / GI | [1993/04] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states DANSK INDUSTRI SYNDIKAT A/S Herlev Hovedgade 15-17 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | ||
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Scanbera A/S Rosenvej 10 DK-2950 Vedbaek / DK | ||
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states Caroe, Claus J. P.O. Box 116, Blaalersvej 81 DK-2990 Niva / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caroe, Claus J. Sejet Bygade 42 DK-8700 Horsens / DK | [1991/17] |
Former [1991/04] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Birkeholm, Mogens, et al Larsen & Birkeholm ApS Skagensgade 64 P.O. Box 200 DK-2630 Taastrup / DK | [1991/17] |
Former [1991/04] | Birkeholm, Mogens Larsen & Birkeholm ApS Skagensgade 64 P.O. Box 200 DK-2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 88910408.9 | 10.11.1988 | [1991/04] | WO1988DK00187 | Priority number, date | DE19873738952 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3738952 | [1991/04] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904733 | Date: | 01.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408555 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408555 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/02, B21D51/52, // A01G9/02, A01G9/14 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
A01G9/026 (EP);
A01G9/1423 (EP);
B21D51/52 (EP);
Y02A40/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LäNGLICHEN PFLANZENKüBELS MIT ABSCHLUSSWäNDEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1993/09] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCIND AN OBLONG PLANT TROUGH WITH END WALLS AND APPARATUS FOR THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE METHOD | [1993/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN BAC A PLANTES OBLONG AVEC DES PAROIS D'EXTREMITE ET APPAREIL DE REALISATION DUDIT PROCEDE | [1993/09] |
Former [1991/04] | VERFAHREN ZUM VERSEHEN EINES LÄNGLICHEN PFLANZENKÜBELS MIT ENDWÄNDEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1991/04] | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING AN OBLONG PLANT TROUGH WITH END WALLS AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
Former [1991/04] | PROCEDE SERVANT A EQUIPER UN BAC A PLANTES DE FORME ALLONGEE AVEC DES PAROIS TERMINALES ET APPAREIL DE REALISATION DUDIT PROCEDE | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1989 | Translation filed | 21.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.05.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 22.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.1993 | BE | 03.03.1993 | CH | 03.03.1993 | DE | 03.03.1993 | FR | 03.03.1993 | IT | 03.03.1993 | LI | 03.03.1993 | NL | 03.03.1993 | SE | 03.03.1993 | GB | 10.11.1993 | LU | 30.11.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 03.03.1993 | |
BE | 03.03.1993 | ||
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
IT | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
FR | 23.07.1993 | ||
GB | 10.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.03.1993 | |
BE | 03.03.1993 | ||
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
IT | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
FR | 23.07.1993 | ||
GB | 10.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 03.03.1993 | |
BE | 03.03.1993 | ||
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
FR | 23.07.1993 | ||
GB | 10.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 03.03.1993 | |
BE | 03.03.1993 | ||
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
FR | 23.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/23] | BE | 03.03.1993 | |
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
FR | 23.07.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 03.03.1993 | |
CH | 03.03.1993 | ||
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | CH | 03.03.1993 | |
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
SE | 03.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/45] | CH | 03.03.1993 | |
DE | 03.03.1993 | ||
LI | 03.03.1993 | ||
NL | 03.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | DE | 03.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US641722 (MCCANDLESS ARLANDA C [US]); | [A]US1997839 (TINKHAM GUY L); | [A]FR1485685 (NORMANDE DE CARTON ONDULE SOC, et al); | [A]US3927823 (PERSSON KARL RUNE); | [A]DE2723443 (BREVETEAM SA); | [A]US4305340 (IWAKI TAKASHI, et al); | [A]SE423173 (ALBERTSSON ELOF) |