EP0326799 - Enzymatic process for synthesizing peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kula, Maria-Regina, Prof. Selgenbusch 12 D-5162 Niederzier/Hambach / DE | 02 /
Flösheimer, Andreas, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 33 D-5170 Jülich / DE | [1989/32] | Application number, filing date | 89100077.0 | 04.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19883803124 | 03.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803124 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326799 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326799 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/02 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
C07K1/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur enzymatischen Peptidsynthese | [1989/32] | English: | Enzymatic process for synthesizing peptides | [1989/32] | French: | Procédé enzymatique pour synthétiser des peptides | [1989/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4086136 ; | [XD]US4339534 ; | [XD]EP0149594 | [XP] - MONATSHEFTE FÜR CHEMIE, Band 119, 1988, Seiten 1323-1331, Springer-Verlag; A. FLÖRSHEIMER et al.: "The application of Nalpha-formyl amino acid esters in the enzyme-catalyzed peptide synthesis" |