EP0325117 - Bogie-like undercarriage for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUEWAG Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 145 47829 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states DUEWAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Duisburger Strasse 145 D-47829 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Otto Burgerstrasse 11 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Schraut, Rolf, Dr.-Ing. Bonhoefferstrasse 25 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 1 / DE | 03 /
Sonder, Egbert Grüner Weg 58 D-4950 Minden / DE | [1990/49] |
Former [1989/30] | 01 /
Braun, Otto Burgerstrasse 11 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | ||
02 /
Schraut, Rolf, Dr.-Ing. Bonhoefferstrasse 25 D-4050 Mönchengladbach 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100147.1 | 05.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | DE19883801833 | 22.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3801833 | DE19883821955 | 29.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3821955 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325117 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325117 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325117 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B61H5/00, B61H13/24, B61H13/02 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
B61H13/02 (EP);
B61H13/24 (EP);
B61H5/00 (EP,KR);
F16D55/2245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Drehgestellartiges Fahrwerk für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1989/30] | English: | Bogie-like undercarriage for railway vehicles | [1989/30] | French: | Châssis du type boggie pour véhicules ferroviaires | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 23.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.10.1991 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0050888 (SAB INDUSTRI AB [SE]); | [A]US3939779 (PRINGLE WILLIAM L) |