EP0325121 - Anchoring piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANZ INDUSTRIE-TECHNIK AG CH-4855 Wolfwil / CH | [1989/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrenberg, Kurt Sin Tea 1 CH-6914 Carona / CH | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Meier, Robert Patentanwalt Auf dem Mühlberg 16 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Meier, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Auf dem Mühlberg 16 D-60599 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100185.1 | 07.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | DE19883801143 | 16.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3801143 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325121 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325121 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/40, E05D5/06 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
B21D28/06 (EP);
B21D35/00 (EP);
B21D53/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/30] | B65B61/14, B21D35/00, B21D28/06, E05B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI [1989/30] | Title | German: | Befestigungsstück | [1989/30] | English: | Anchoring piece | [1989/30] | French: | Elément de fixation | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/14] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US876195 ; | [X]US3008175 ; | [A]GB1524075 ; | [A]DE2154562 | [A] - OFFICIAL GAZETTE, US PATENT OFFICE, 7. Januar 1908, Seite 168; & US-A-876 195 (O.O. KITTLESON), & US876195 A 00000000 |