EP0325923 - Process for enclosing a pencil, lead and pencil lead obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARAN D'ACHE S.A. Chemin du Foron 19 Case postale 169 CH-1226 Thonex-Genève / CH | [1989/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chenal, Jean-Bernard Les Tattes F-74140 Saint-Cergues / FR | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 89100201.6 | 07.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | CH19880000179 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: CH 17988 | [1989/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325923 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325923 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B43K19/16, B43K19/14 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
B43K19/14 (EP);
B43K19/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Umhüllen von Bleistiften und ein nach diesem Verfahren hergestellter Bleistift | [1989/31] | English: | Process for enclosing a pencil, lead and pencil lead obtained by this process | [1989/31] | French: | Procédé de gainage d'un crayon et crayon obtenu par ce procédé | [1989/31] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/18] | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3520627 ; | [Y]DE3618706 ; | [X]US2168993 ; | [A]US3022543 ; | [A]DE2234737 |