EP0331872 - Rotobaler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenland Geldrop B.V. Nuenenseweg 165 NL-5667 KP Geldrop / NL | [1992/28] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states P.J. Zweegers en Zonen Landbouwmachinefabriek B.V. Nuenenseweg 165 NL-5667 KP Geldrop / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berkers, A. Gebr. de Koningstr. 21 Heeze / NL | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/37] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100432.7 | 11.01.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | DE19880002337U | 23.02.1988 Original published format: DE 8802337 U | [1989/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331872 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331872 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331872 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
A01F15/07 (EP,US);
A01F2015/078 (EP,US);
A01F2015/0795 (EP,US);
A01F2015/183 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/37] | A01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Rundballenpresse | [1989/37] | English: | Rotobaler | [1989/37] | French: | Presse à balles rondes | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2336491 (LUEBBEN UMMO F); | [A]EP0037155 (SPERRY CORP [US]); | [Y]DE3107744 (GUMMI JAEGER KG GMBH & CIE [DE]); | [A]EP0125719 (MULTINORM BV [NL]); | [A]EP0213219 (JAEGER ARNOLD) |