EP0326843 - Coating chamber with regulated composition of the gas mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multi-Arc Oberflächentechnik GmbH Am Böttcherberg 30-38 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states Multi-Arc Oberflächentechnik GmbH Am Böttcherberg 30-38 D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states MULTI-ARC GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states INTERATOM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse D-51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maxam, Siegfried Unterschelmrath 27 D-5250 Engelskirchen / DE | 02 /
Frink, Lothar Am Heidberg 5 D-5223 Nümbrecht / DE | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner, et al Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte, et al Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/08] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100664.5 | 16.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19880001079U | 29.01.1988 Original published format: DE 8801079 U | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326843 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326843 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/54, H01J37/32 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
H01J37/3244 (EP);
C23C14/0042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Beschichtungskammer mit geregelter Zusammensetzung der Gasatmosphäre | [1989/32] | English: | Coating chamber with regulated composition of the gas mixture | [1989/32] | French: | Chambre de revêtement avec composition contrôlée des gaz | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/43] | 11.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54103790 ; | [A]JP60155669 ; | [A]DE1521248 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]US3881093 (ANDRE MARCEL, et al); | [A]FR2350639 (BERGHAUS IONIT ANSTALT [LI]); | [A]FR2371009 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]GB2021294 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [A]GB2180081 (ION TECH LTD); | [A]FR2595801 (INNOVATIQUE SA [FR]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 20, Nr. 12, Mai 1978, Seiten 5379-5380, New York, US; P. SILANO: "Automatic pressure control of mixed gases" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 123 (C-61), 16. Oktober 1979; & JP-A-54 103 790 (NIPPON DENKI) 15-08-1979, & JP54103790 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 324 (C-320)[2047], 19. Dezember 1985; & JP-A-60 155 669 (SHINKUU KIKAI) 15-08-1985, & JP60155669 A 00000000 |