EP0325225 - Concentrates of coagulation factors II, VII, IX and/or X, their preparation and use, and method for the determination of coagulation factor VII [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tessek sdruzeni Praha Krizovnická 3 CS-110 00 Praha 1 / CS | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states TESSEK SDRUZENI PRAHA Krizovnická 3 CS-110 00 Praha 1 / CS | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rybák, Miroslav, Dipl.Ing. Nesporova 573 Praha 4 / CS | 02 /
Kasafirek, Evzen, Dipl.-Ing. Lomena 27 Praha 6 / CS | 03 /
Housková, Jitka, Dipl.-Ing. Tyrsova 480 Letovice / CS | 04 /
Losticky, Cyril, RNdr. Podskalská 18 Praha 2 / CS | 05 /
Ulrych, Stanislav, RNdr. Kovpakova 2 Praha 2 / CS | 06 /
Sedlmaier, Oldrich Zborovská 14 Praha 5 / CS | 07 /
Roubalová, Alena Holandská 23 Praha 10 / CS | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100788.2 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | CS19880000324 | 18.01.1988 Original published format: CS 32488 | CS19880000869 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: CS 86988 | CS19880002890 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: CS 289088 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0325225 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0325225 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/16, C12Q1/56, C12N9/64 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C12N9/647 (EP,US);
C12Q1/56 (EP,US);
G01N33/523 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2337/12 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96444 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1989/30] | C07K3/20, C12N9/64, C12Q1/56 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/30] | Title | German: | Konzentrate von Gerinnungsfaktoren II, VII, IX und/oder X, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung und Methode zur Bestimmung des Gerinnungsfaktors VII | [1989/30] | English: | Concentrates of coagulation factors II, VII, IX and/or X, their preparation and use, and method for the determination of coagulation factor VII | [1989/30] | French: | Concentrés de facteurs de coagulation II, VII, IX et/ou X, leur préparation et application et méthode pour la détermination du facteur de coagulation VII | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/37] | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0208215 (MILES LAB [US]); | [XP]EP0303329 (RIETHORST WAANDER [NL]); | [Y]EP0229234 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4637932 (PANCHAM NAZREEN [US]) | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 256, no. 1, 1981, pages 253-259; S.P. BAJAJ et al.: "Isolation and characterization of human factor VII" |