EP0326925 - Anchor board system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAC-FAST Systems SA Route Du Bugnon 15, Case postale 106 CH-1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | [1994/36] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states Pacione, Joseph Rocco 127 Elgin Street Thornhill Ontario / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pacione, Joseph Rocco 127 Elgin Street Thornhill, Ontario / CA | [1994/36] |
Former [1989/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101267.6 | 25.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | US19880148711 | 26.01.1988 Original published format: US 148711 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326925 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326925 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326925 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04C2/00 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
E04F15/02138 (EP);
E04B2/00 (KR);
C07C43/225 (KR);
E04F13/0882 (EP);
E04F19/0472 (EP);
E04F2019/044 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/32] | E04F13/08, E04B1/60 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Ankersystem für Platten | [1989/32] | English: | Anchor board system | [1989/32] | French: | Système d'ancrage pour panneaux | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7029524U (VELCRO FRANCE [FR]); | [A]DE2744009 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]DE7706130U ; | [A]US3499102 (GILLEMOT GEORGE W, et al) |