EP0379621 - Tyre pyrolysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zink, Helmut Kelterstrasse 43 D-7441 Unterensingen / DE | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101391.4 | 27.01.1989 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379621 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10B53/00, C10B1/10 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
C10B1/10 (EP);
C10B49/02 (EP);
C10B49/04 (EP);
C10B53/00 (EP);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10K1/06 (EP);
Y02P20/143 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/31] | Title | German: | Reifen-Pyrolyse | [1990/31] | English: | Tyre pyrolysis | [1990/31] | French: | Pyrolyse de pneus | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3997407 ; | [Y]US3362887 ; | [A]AT385050B ; | [A]DE430366 ; | [A]DE2835267 ; | [A]US4030984 |