EP0327927 - Detergent additive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Jochen, Dr. Am Acker 20 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Weber, Rudolf Am Nettchesfeld 51 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 03 /
Pochandke, Winfried Hegelstrasse 19 D-4019 Monheim 2 / DE | [1989/33] | Application number, filing date | 89101618.0 | 31.01.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | DE19883803630 | 06.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803630 | [1989/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0327927 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0327927 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
C11D3/0021 (EP);
C11D3/3776 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/33] | Title | German: | Waschmittelzusatz | [1989/33] | English: | Detergent additive | [1989/33] | French: | Additif pour détergents | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 22.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0203486 ; | [X]DE114606 ; | [X]FR2263298 ; | [XP]EP0265257 |