EP0330003 - Screw extruder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.09.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik Ges.m.b.H. A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Alois Pöttinger Maschinenfabrik GmbH A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frauscher, Josef A-4942 Gurten 50 / AT | 02 /
Groisböck, Franz Styriastrasse 1 A-4713 Gallspach / AT | 03 /
Leposa, Wolfgang Sonnefeldsiedlung 30 A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 04 /
Pöcherstorfer, Manfred A-4724 Neukirchen a.W. 60 / AT | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Dupal, Helmut Jägerweg 12 4702 Wallern / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Dupal, Helmut, Dipl-Ing. Jägerweg 12 A-4702 Wallern / AT | Application number, filing date | 89101988.7 | 04.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | DE19883806146 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3806146 | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330003 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330003 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0330003 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/24 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
B30B11/246 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Schneckenpresse | [1989/35] | English: | Screw extruder | [1989/35] | French: | Extrudeuse | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.1992
04.11.1992
ADMISSIBLE Raimund Falkner Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. 0 A-6426 Roppen 64 / AT Opponent's representative Torggler, Paul, et al, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.10.1992
04.11.1992
ADMISSIBLE Raimund Falkner Maschinenbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. 0 A-6426 Roppen 64 / AT Opponent's representative Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Paul Torggler Dr. Engelbert Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | 22.10.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 31.10.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 10.11.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.03.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.02.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.08.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.01.1992 | BE | 28.02.1994 | NL | 01.09.1994 | SE | 05.02.1995 | FR | 31.10.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1996/19] | BE | 28.02.1994 | |
NL | 01.09.1994 | ||
SE | 05.02.1995 | ||
FR | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 28.02.1994 | |
NL | 01.09.1994 | ||
SE | 05.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/13] | BE | 28.02.1994 | |
NL | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 28.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | US731735 [ ] (ANDERSON VALERIUS D [US]); | US767737 [ ] (CUNNINGHAM WILLIAM R [US]); | GB310680 [ ] (PERCY VAVASSEUR APPLEBY); | DE1502337 [ ] (WERNER & PFLEIDERER); | CH627128 [ ] (REINHALL P G [US]) |