EP0330006 - Method and apparatus for precise separation of synchronisation pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULGARSKA TELEVISIA kam KOMITET sa TELEVISIA i RADIO San-Stefano Strasse 29 Sofia / BG | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vladkov, Emil Pentchev, Dipl.-Ing. Komplex Serdika Block 21, App.40 BG-1303 Sofia / BG | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Ebbinghaus, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102045.5 | 06.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | BG19880083105 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: BG 8310588 | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330006 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330006 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/08 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
H04N5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum präzisen Abtrennen von Synchronimpulsen | [1989/35] | English: | Method and apparatus for precise separation of synchronisation pulses | [1989/35] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la séparation précise des impulsions de synchronisation | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 10.06.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4385319 (HASEGAWA KENICHI [JP]) |