EP0331923 - Still Picture transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuda, Yoshinori Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki K. Gumma Works 800 Ooaza Iwamatsu Ojima-machi Nittagun Gumma / JP | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102282.4 | 10.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | JP19880034324 | 17.02.1988 Original published format: JP 3432488 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331923 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331923 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/42 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (KR);
H04N7/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/37] | Title | German: | Stehbildübertragungsgerät | [1989/37] | English: | Still Picture transmission device | [1989/37] | French: | Appareil pour la transmission d'images immobiles | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 13.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3213266 [ ] (RICOH KK [JP]); | EP0130018 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | GB2187057 [ ] (ALDEN RES FOUND); | DE2511261 [ ]; | DE1940509 [ ] (XEROX CORP) |