blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0330047

EP0330047 - Method for the sterilization of blood, plasma, blood derivatives, plasma derivatives, cell suspensions or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1989/35]Method for the sterilization of blood, blood derivatives, plasma derivatives, cell suspensions or the like
[1989/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.1993
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH
Landsteiner Strasse 5
D-63303 Dreieich / DE
[1989/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Dichtelmüller, Herbert, Dr.
Rossertstrasse 14
D-6231 Sulzbach/Ts / DE
02 / Stephan Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Philipp-Holzmann-Strasse 84
D-6072 Dreieich / DE
[1989/35]
Representative(s)Wolff, Hans Joachim, et al
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]Wolff, Hans Joachim, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Chem., et al
BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
D-65901 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date89102469.714.02.1989
[1989/35]
Priority number, dateDE1988380545922.02.1988         Original published format: DE 3805459
[1989/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0330047
Date:30.08.1989
Language:DE
[1989/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0330047
Date:19.12.1990
Language:DE
[1990/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0330047
Date:23.09.1992
Language:DE
[1992/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1990
ClassificationIPC:A61L2/18
[1989/35]
CPC:
A61L2/0088 (EP,US); A61K31/07 (EP,US); A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K35/14 (EP,US); A61K35/16 (EP,US); A61L2/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Sterilisation von Blut, Plasma, Blut- und Plasmaderivaten, Zellsuspensionen oder dgl.[1989/35]
English:Method for the sterilization of blood, plasma, blood derivatives, plasma derivatives, cell suspensions or the like[1989/42]
French:Procédé de stérilisation du sang, du plasma, des dérivés du sang et du plasma, des suspensions de cellules ou de produits similaires[1989/35]
Former [1989/35]Method for the sterilization of blood, blood derivatives, plasma derivatives, cell suspensions or the like
Examination procedure20.02.1991Examination requested  [1991/16]
14.02.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.1992Fee for grant paid
15.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.06.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR23.09.1992
AT14.02.1993
GB14.02.1993
ES15.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
BE28.02.1993
CH28.02.1993
LI28.02.1993
LU28.02.1993
[2004/37]
Former [2000/04]GR23.09.1992
AT14.02.1993
GB14.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
BE28.02.1993
CH28.02.1993
LI28.02.1993
LU28.02.1993
Former [1994/32]AT14.02.1993
GB14.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
BE28.02.1993
CH28.02.1993
LI28.02.1993
Former [1994/09]GB14.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
BE28.02.1993
CH28.02.1993
LI28.02.1993
Former [1994/04]GB14.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
CH28.02.1993
LI28.02.1993
Former [1994/02]GB14.02.1993
SE15.02.1993
Former [1993/52]SE15.02.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 103, Nr. 7, 19. August 1985, Seite 315, Zusammenfassung Nr. 51128a, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. MURATA et al.: "A new biological activity in vitro of fat-soluble vitamins and related substances: phage-inactivating effect of vitamins E and K, and coenzyme Q", & AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM. 1985, 49(6), 1903-4
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 82, Nr. 9, 3. März 1975, Seite 4, Zusammenfassung Nr. 51222z, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. MURATA: "Inactivation of viruses by vitamin C. Mechanism of the inactivation", & VITAMINS 1974, 48(10-11), 507-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.