EP0329089 - Paper feeding device for a high-speed single sheet processing printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jos. Hunkeler AG Fabrik für graphische Maschinen Bahnhofstrasse 252 CH-4806 Wikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states Jos. Hunkeler AG Fabrik für graphische Maschinen Bahnhofstrasse 252 CH-4806 Wikon / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felix, Willi Einsiegelweg 3 CH-4802 Strengelbach / CH | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89102531.4 | 14.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | DE19883804903 | 17.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3804903 | [1989/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329089 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/04, B41J11/70 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
B26D9/00 (EP);
B41J11/70 (EP);
B65H23/34 (EP);
B65H35/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Papier zu einem Einzelblätter verarbeitenden Schnelldrucker | [1989/34] | English: | Paper feeding device for a high-speed single sheet processing printer | [1989/34] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en papier pour une imprimante rapide utilisant des feuilles individuelles | [1989/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/24] | 15.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3477324 [ ]; | US3902648 [ ]; | DE2643110 [ ]; | DE3236884 [ ]; | DE2426217 [ ]; | DE3342756 [ ] |