EP0382867 - Control device for the torque-constants of a permanent magnet excited tree-phase motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vollmer, Rolf Weiherberg 4 D-6416 Poppenhausen / DE | [1990/34] | Application number, filing date | 89102593.4 | 15.02.1989 | [1990/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382867 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/62, H02K21/00 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
H02P25/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Steuerung der Drehmomentkonstanten eines dauermagneterregten Drehstrommotors | [1990/34] | English: | Control device for the torque-constants of a permanent magnet excited tree-phase motor | [1990/34] | French: | Appareil de commande des constantes de couple d'un moteur triphasé excité à aimant permanent | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/42] | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.03.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.03.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0205877 ; | [A]DE1563389 ; | [A]DE1076802 |