EP0330106 - Modified cellulose for biocompatible dialysis membranes II, and method for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Postbus 9300 Velperweg 76 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diamantoglou, Michael, Dr. Kolpingstrasse 4 D-8765 Erlenbach/Main / DE | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Fett, Günter Akzo Patente GmbH, Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102853.2 | 18.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | DE19883805992 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3805992 | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330106 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08B3/16, C08B13/00, C08B15/06, C08B37/08, // B01D13/04, A61M1/16 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
C08B3/16 (EP,US);
B01D71/08 (EP,US);
B01D71/12 (EP,US);
B01D71/18 (EP,US);
C08B13/00 (EP,US);
C08B15/06 (EP,US);
C08B37/003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Modifizierte Cellulose für biocompatible Dialysemembranen II und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1989/35] | English: | Modified cellulose for biocompatible dialysis membranes II, and method for its preparation | [1989/35] | French: | Cellulose modifiée, son utilisation comme membranes biocompatibles II et procédé pour sa préparation | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 14.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/20] | 20.01.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/20] | Appeal following examination | 01.04.1995 | Appeal received No. T0483/95 | 02.06.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 06.11.1992 | Appeal received No. T0219/93 | 29.01.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.09.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 19.01.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1991107 (MALM CARL J, et al); | [X]US2430911 (HALE CHARCH WILLIAM, et al); | [X]US2453275 (SEYMOUR GEORGE W, et al); | [X]US3314940 (THERESE LEMMERLING JOSE, et al); | [X]US3489743 (CRANE CARLTON L); | [X]US3816150 (ISHII K, et al); | [X]EP0028126 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US4487926 (ISHIKAWA NOBUO [JP], et al); | [X]US4520192 (NAMIKOSHI HAJIME [JP]); | [X]EP0146277 (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]); | [A]EP0172437 (AKZO GMBH [DE]); | [XPD]DE3723897 (AKZO GMBH [DE]) | [X] - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, Band 37, Nr. 12, Juni 1967, Seite 750, Nr. 8820, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; M.Y. PORMALE et al.: "Acetylation of cellulose ethers containing higher alkyls and the properties of the mixed derivatives", & ZH. PRIKL. KHIM. 39, no. 11, 1966, Seiten 2567-2570 |