EP0330130 - Infusion solution container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schiwa GmbH Postfach 11 80 D-49215 Glandorf / DE | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Recker, Antonius Sudendorf 32 D-4519 Glandorf / DE | 02 /
Rycyk, Manfred Lortzingstrasse 14 D-5416 Bissendorf / DE | 03 /
Wesseler, Matthias Uphoefener Feld 16 D-4517 Hilter 2 / DE | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/52] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/35] | Springer, Hans Jörg, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89102943.1 | 21.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | DE19880002443U | 25.02.1988 Original published format: DE 8802443 U | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330130 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330130 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP,US);
A61J1/10 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Behälter für Infusionslösungen | [1989/35] | English: | Infusion solution container | [1989/35] | French: | Récipient pour solution d'infusion | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3788369 (KILLINGER F); | [A]WO8303587 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]DE8021253U ; | [A]CH475757 (VIFOR SA [CH]) |