blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0330198

EP0330198 - Heat exchanger as an injection evaporator for a refrigeration machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.1992
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.1994Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Klüe, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Richtweg 93A
D-21502 Geesthacht / DE
[1989/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Klüe, Ulrich, Dipl.- Ing.
93a Richtweg
D-2054 Geesthacht / DE
02 / Hartmann, Wilhelm, Dipl.- Ing.
6 Parkstrasse
D-2121 Tespe / DE
[1989/35]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date89103178.323.02.1989
[1989/35]
Priority number, dateDE19880002339U23.02.1988         Original published format: DE 8802339 U
[1989/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0330198
Date:30.08.1989
Language:DE
[1989/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0330198
Date:19.09.1990
Language:DE
[1990/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0330198
Date:15.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.1990
ClassificationIPC:F25B39/02
[1989/35]
CPC:
F28F3/12 (EP); F25B31/004 (EP); F25B39/024 (EP);
F28F13/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/35]
TitleGerman:Wärmeaustauscher als Einspritzverdampfer für eine Kältemaschine[1989/35]
English:Heat exchanger as an injection evaporator for a refrigeration machine[1989/35]
French:Echangeur de chaleur en tant qu'évaporateur à injection pour une machine frigorifique[1989/35]
Examination procedure27.08.1990Examination requested  [1990/43]
27.08.1990Request for accelerated examination filed
08.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.1991Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.1991Fee for grant paid
19.08.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE15.01.1992
AT23.02.1992
[1994/18]
Former [1992/32]SE15.01.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60200089  ;
 [AD]DE161027  ;
 [A]US1622376  (DAVENPORT RANSOM W);
 [A]DE570166  (LINDE EISMASCH AG);
 [AD]US2028213  (HEMPHILL ARTHUR R);
 [A]DE690583  (PFAUDLER CO INC);
 [AD]US2414952  (JOHNSON BERNARD C);
 [AD]GB1286446  (JOHANNES BURMESTER & CO [DE]);
 [A]NL7905978  (BRINK LUCHTVERWARMING BV);
 [AD]DE3147378  (JOHS BURMESTER & CO GMBH [DE]);
 [AD]DE3309979  (SLADKY HANS);
 [AD]FR2549585  (AXERGIE SA [FR]);
 [AD]DE3536325  (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 51 (M-457)[2108], 28. Februar 1986; & JP-A-60 200 089 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 09-10-1985, & JP60200089 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.