Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE94670T | 15.10.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | EP89103352 | 25.02.1989 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH674274 | 15.05.1990 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH677543 | 31.05.1991 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0338218 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1993 | B1 | EP0338218 | 25.10.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1322781 | 05.10.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58905587D1 | 21.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI891504 | 01.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01270199 | 27.10.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO891328L | 02.10.1989 | L | NO891328D0 | 29.03.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5005003 | 02.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CH476088 | 23.12.1988 | CH119388 | 30.03.1988 |