EP0331061 - Substituted hydrazones and fungicides containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenderoth, Bernd, Dr. Schwalbenstrasse 26 D-6840 Lampertheim / DE | 02 /
Brand, Siegbert, Dr. Hegelstrasse 39 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
Schuetz, Franz, Dr. Budapester Strasse 45 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Sauter, Hubert, Dr. Neckarpromenade 20 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 05 /
Ammermann, Eberhard, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 3 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Lorenz, Gisela, Dr. Erlenweg 13 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | [1989/36] | Application number, filing date | 89103363.1 | 25.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883806874 | 03.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3806874 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331061 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331061 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0331061 | Date: | 27.09.1990 | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C251/72, C07C69/738, A01N37/10 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
A01N37/50 (EP,US);
C07C243/18 (KR);
C07C251/86 (EP,US);
C07C255/54 (EP,US);
C07C255/57 (EP,US);
C07C255/58 (EP,US);
C07C255/66 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/36] | C07C109/16, C07C69/738, A01N37/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Substituierte Hydrazone und diese enthaltende Fungizide | [1989/36] | English: | Substituted hydrazones and fungicides containing them | [1989/36] | French: | Hydrazones substitués et fongicides les contenant | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 27.07.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.1989 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.1989 | 23.05.1989 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1768136 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE1768137 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2118468 ; | [A]US4163062 (CLARK MICHAEL T [GB], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Band 98, Nr. 8, 25. April 1983, Seite 614, Zusammenfassung Nr. 125811v, Columbus, Ohio, USA; D. NARDI et al.: "Nucleophilic opening of the hetero-ring of N-acylisatins by acylhydrazines." |