EP0331090 - Process for producing contact lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikushima, Akira 3-1-19-102, Suge-Sengoku Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Sawamoto, Takeyuki 3-2-11, Kamiogi Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103434.0 | 27.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | JP19880047199 | 29.02.1988 Original published format: JP 4719988 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331090 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331090 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02C7/04, B29C71/04 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
B26F1/28 (EP,US);
B29C71/04 (EP,US);
B29D11/00076 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0045 (EP,US);
B29C35/0866 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0065 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/36] | B29D11/00, G02C7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Kontaktlinsen | [1989/36] | English: | Process for producing contact lens | [1989/36] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de lentilles de contact | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/42] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP58048022 ; | [AD]JP56161436 ; | [A]DE2151028 (KEMMETMUELLER ROLAND DIPL ING, et al); | [A]FR2124414 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [X]US3811999 (FLEISCHER R, et al); | [X]GB1375204 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 130 (P-202)[1275], 7th June 1983; & JP-A-58 048 022 (TOUKIYOU KONTAKTUTORENZU KENKYUSHO K.K.) 19-03-1983, & JP58048022 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 44 (C-95)[922], 19th March 1982; & JP-A-56 161 436 (TOKYO KONTAKTORENZU KENKYUSHO K.K.) 11-12-1981, & JP56161436 A 00000000 |