EP0332066 - Applicator for applying materials to clean, care for and medicate the skin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latzke, Gert Hasenbühlweg 13 CH-9410 Heiden / CH | [1989/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1989/37] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103730.1 | 03.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | DE19883807653 | 09.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3807653 | DE19883842023 | 14.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3842023 | [1989/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0332066 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0332066 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
A45D34/04 (EP,KR);
A45D2200/1018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Applikator für Hautreinigungsmittel, Hautpflegemittel und medizinische Einreibemittel | [1989/37] | English: | Applicator for applying materials to clean, care for and medicate the skin | [1989/37] | French: | Application pour produits de nettoyage et de soins de la peau et pour produits médicaux à frictionner | [1989/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2964772 (CRAWFORD CLAUD F); | [AD]US2995768 (MICHAL SKURATOWICZ); | [A]US4183684 (AVERY CARL F JR [US]); | [YD]DE8023733U ; | [X]DE3629565 (LATZKE ARNO W [CH], et al) |