EP0378736 - Load-adjusting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [1990/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfalzgraf, Manfred Luisenstrasse 24 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 02 /
Hickmann, Gerd Kirchgasse 3 D-6231 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | 03 /
Mausner, Eberhard In den Weingärten 25 D-6270 Liederbach/Ts. / DE | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Klein, Thomas Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sodener Strasse 9 D-65824 Schwalbach/Ts. / DE | Application number, filing date | 89103838.2 | 04.03.1989 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | DE19893901583 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901583 | [1990/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378736 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378736 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
F02D11/10 (EP,US);
F02D31/004 (EP,US);
F02D2011/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Lastverstelleinrichtung | [1990/30] | English: | Load-adjusting device | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de la charge | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3711779 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [A]US4796579 (WOLFE BRIAN C [US], et al); | [A]DE3712927 (AUDI AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0300479 |