EP0332996 - Thermoplastic moulding compositions based on mixtures of vinyl chloride polymers and block copolymers based on cyclic carbonates and lactones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eichenauer, Herbert, Dr. Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 3 D-4047 Dormagen 1 / DE | 02 /
Leitz, Edgar, Dr. Goethestrasse 63 D-4047 Dormagen 1 / DE | 03 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Meier, Lothar, Dr. Buchenstrasse 31b D-4322 Sprockhoevel 2 / DE | 05 /
Gärtner, Maria, Dipl.-Ing. Auf der Höhe 82 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | [1989/38] | Application number, filing date | 89103977.8 | 07.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | DE19883808842 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3808842 | [1989/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332996 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332996 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/06, // (C08L27/06, 69:00) | [1989/38] | CPC: |
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L27/06, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L69/005, C08L27/04 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L27/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/38] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Formmassen auf Basis von Mischungen aus Vinylchloridpolymerisaten und Blockcopolymeren auf Basis cyclischer Carbonate und Lactone | [1992/21] | English: | Thermoplastic moulding compositions based on mixtures of vinyl chloride polymers and block copolymers based on cyclic carbonates and lactones | [1989/38] | French: | Matières à mouler thermoplastiques à base de mélanges de polymères de chlorure de vinyle et de copolymères segmentés à base de carbonates cycliques et de lactones | [1989/38] |
Former [1989/38] | Thermoplastische Formmassen aus Basis von Mischungen aus Vinylchloridpolymerisaten und Blockcopolymeren auf Basis cyclischer Carbonate und Lactone | Examination procedure | 07.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 28.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3557252 (HSIEH HENRY L, et al); | [A]EP0118706 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) |