EP0340421 - Conducting varnish composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. No. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Tomio 2-20-22, Koya Ichikawa-shi / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Shigeru 30-3-402, Nagatakita-1-chome Minami-ku Yokohama / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Kikuko 204, Tobecho-5-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama / JP | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104220.2 | 09.03.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | JP19880064399 | 16.03.1988 Original published format: JP 6439988 | JP19880250860 | 06.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25086088 | [1989/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0340421 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0340421 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0340421 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/24, H01B1/12 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/45] | C09D5/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/45] | Title | German: | Elektrisch leitende Lack-Zusammensetzung | [1989/45] | English: | Conducting varnish composition | [1989/45] | French: | Composition de vernis conducteur | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP55142050 ; | [A]BE668658 ; | [A]DE3617268 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 16 (C-41)[688], 30th January 1981; & JP-A-55 142 050 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO) 06-11-1980, & JP55142050 A 00000000 |