EP0339228 - Tensioning device for attaching a flexible film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandes, Harry V. Stauffenbergstrasse 13 D-6053 Obertshausen / DE | 02 /
Raab, Rudolf Innweg 4 D-6450 Hanau 7 / DE | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Marek, Joachim c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Marek, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104456.2 | 14.03.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883813777 | 23.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3813777 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339228 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339228 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339228 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
B41F27/1231 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Spanneinrichtung zum Befestigen einer biegsamen Folie | [1989/44] | English: | Tensioning device for attaching a flexible film | [1989/44] | French: | Dispositif à tensionner pour la fixation d'un film flexible | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2341326 (ROLAND OFFSETMASCHF) |