EP0333150 - Tillage equipment with telescopic security flap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dutzi, Friedhelm Kapellenstrasse 14 D-7526 Ubstadt-Weiher 4 / DE | [1989/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26 D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104562.7 | 15.03.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | DE19880003705U | 18.03.1988 Original published format: DE 8803705 U | [1989/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333150 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333150 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01B33/12, A01B49/02, A01B49/06 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
A01B49/065 (EP);
A01B33/12 (EP);
A01B49/022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/38] | A01B33/12, A01B49/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/38] | Title | German: | Bodenbearbeitungsgerät mit Teleskop-Schutzklappe | [1989/38] | English: | Tillage equipment with telescopic security flap | [1989/38] | French: | Materiel de travail du sol avec trappe de protection téléscopique | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 17.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4552079 ; | [X]EP0170156 ; | [X]DE8714440U ; | [Y]DD235992 ; | [A]EP0033950 |