EP0335199 - Process for ulholstering a mattress core and a correspondingly fabricated mattress [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPÜHL AG Lukasstrasse 18 CH-9009 St. Gallen / CH | [1989/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mumenthaler, Fritz Dipl.-Ing. Winkelriedstrasse 36 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 89104792.0 | 17.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | DE19883811130 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3811130 | [1989/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335199 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/00, A47C31/00 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
A47C27/002 (EP);
A47C27/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beziehen eines Matratzenkerns und danach hergestellte Matratze | [1989/40] | English: | Process for ulholstering a mattress core and a correspondingly fabricated mattress | [1989/40] | French: | Procédé pour recouvrir un matelas et matelas ainsi fabriqué | [1989/40] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 05.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/37] | 26.04.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR912642 ; | [Y]GB814551 ; | [AD]US2973526 |