EP0336179 - Apparatus for piling printed articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Godber Zeppelinstrasse 22 D-8900 Augsburg 1 / DE | [1989/41] | Application number, filing date | 89104865.4 | 18.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | DE19883811289 | 02.04.1988 Original published format: DE 3811289 | [1989/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336179 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336179 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336179 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/30, B65H31/28, B41F13/70 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B41F13/70 (EP);
B65H31/28 (EP);
B65H31/3009 (EP);
B65H31/3054 (EP);
B65H31/3081 (EP);
B65H2301/33222 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stapeln von Druckprodukten | [1989/41] | English: | Apparatus for piling printed articles | [1989/41] | French: | Dispositif d'empilage de produits imprimés | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4678387 (SJOGREN CHRISTER A [US], et al); | [A]FR2521965 (BOBST SA [CH]); | [A]WO8800921 (LIEBE HERZING F GRAPHISCHE [AT]); | [AP]EP0272543 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [A]US4065117 (THORSHEIM IVAR); | [A]FR2249009 (BOBST FILS SA J [CH]) |