blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0344422

EP0344422 - Air bag for motor vehicle passengers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.1994 [1994/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daimler-Benz AG
Mercedesstrasse 143
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 600202 Mercedesstrasse 136
D-70327 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Henseler, Wolfgang
Stauffenbergstrasse 88
D-7400 Tübingen / DE
02 / Brambilla, Luigi, Dr.
Schurwaldstrasse 11
D-7030 Böblingen / DE
03 / Müller, Manfred
Ob der Steige 17
D-7301 Deizisau / DE
04 / Bossenmaier, Alban
Urbanstrasse 77
D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE
05 / Katz, Egon
Beethovenstrasse 10
D-7270 Nagold 7 / DE
06 / Mast, Horst
Gartenstrasse 40
D-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
[1989/49]
Application number, filing date89105186.423.03.1989
[1989/49]
Priority number, dateDE1988381818528.05.1988         Original published format: DE 3818185
[1989/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0344422
Date:06.12.1989
Language:DE
[1989/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0344422
Date:30.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0344422
Date:23.06.1993
Language:DE
[1993/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1990
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/20
[1991/10]
CPC:
B60R21/2342 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/49]B60R21/16
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/49]
TitleGerman:Aufprallschutzkissen für den Insassen eines Kraftfahrzeuges[1989/49]
English:Air bag for motor vehicle passengers[1989/49]
French:Sac d'air pour les occupants d'un véhicule[1989/49]
Examination procedure22.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/09]
26.08.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.09.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1992Fee for grant paid
23.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE2722551  (DAIMLER BENZ AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.