EP0334388 - Coating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation No. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanimoto, Yoshio Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakahama, Tadamitsu Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamane, Tabakazu Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Ferdinand-Maria-Strasse 12 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105442.1 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | JP19880071333 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7133388 | JP19880071334 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7133488 | JP19880071338 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: JP 7133888 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334388 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334388 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334388 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/00, B05D7/14, B05D7/16 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B05B13/0221 (EP,US);
B05B16/20 (EP,US);
B05D1/002 (EP,US);
B05D3/0272 (EP,US);
B05B13/0452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/39] | Title | German: | Beschichtungsverfahren | [1989/39] | English: | Coating method | [1989/39] | French: | Procédé de revêtement | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0261644 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) |