EP0335368 - Pressure control system for stern tube seals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOVER JAPAN INC 3-27 Kioichio Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuwabara, Tsuneo 1286-13 Mukaishinjo Toyama-shi / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Jingo 5-5 Higashimachi Uozo-shi / JP | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105538.6 | 29.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | JP19880043838 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: JP 4383888 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335368 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335368 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/40, B63H23/36 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
F16J15/40 (EP,US);
B63H23/36 (EP,US);
B63H2023/327 (EP,US);
Y10S277/927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/40] | Title | German: | Druckregulierungssystem für Stevenrohrabdichtung | [1989/40] | English: | Pressure control system for stern tube seals | [1989/40] | French: | Système de régulation de pression pour l'étanchéité du tube d'étambot | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2746592 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT); | [Y]US3653350 (KOONS HAROLD O, et al); | [A]DE2643769 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT); | [A]FR2160105 (FORSHEDA IDEUTVECKLING AB) |