EP0359900 - Process for separating highly molecular substances from liquid culture media, and device for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Sepatech GmbH Postfach 12 20 D-37502 Osterode am Harz / DE | [1990/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmeisser, Holger, Dr. Heinz-Hilpert-Strasse 6 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Köhn, Heinz-Gerhard, Dr. Grüner Weg 6 D-3402 Dransfeld / DE | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Heinen, Gerhard Heraeus Holding GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Heinen, Gerhard, Dr. Heraeus Holding GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105590.7 | 30.03.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883831771 | 19.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3831771 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0359900 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0359900 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359900 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P1/00, C12M1/12 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
C12N1/02 (EP,US);
C12M47/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abtrennen von hochmolekularen Substanzen aus flüssigen Nährmedien sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1990/13] | English: | Process for separating highly molecular substances from liquid culture media, and device for carrying out the process | [1990/13] | French: | Procédé de séparation de substances de haut poids moléculaire à partir de milieux nutritifs liquides ainsi qu'une installation pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1989 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63107710 ; | [A]DE3840447 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 109, 1988, Seite 114, Zusammenfassung Nr. 95251p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 107 710 (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD) 12-05-1988, & JP63107710 A 00000000 |