EP0389659 - Projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theill, Christian Via Piana 81 B I-50124 Firenze / IT | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 89105642.6 | 30.03.1989 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389659 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
F21V19/0005 (EP);
F21V29/71 (US);
F21V19/0075 (EP);
F21V21/30 (EP);
F21V21/34 (EP);
F21V23/02 (EP);
F21V29/15 (EP);
F21V29/73 (EP);
F21V29/763 (EP);
F21V29/89 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/46] |
Former [1990/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Strahler | [1990/40] | English: | Projector | [1990/40] | French: | Projecteur | [1990/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, GR, LU | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.04.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.04.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB829441 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]GB966913 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]GB1028007 (COMMERCIAL LIGHTING LTD); | [A]US3459934 (MOORE BUELL); | [A]DE2501863 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [A]FR2394749 (NIEMUTH KURT [DE]) |