blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0340455

EP0340455 - Pivot bearing for the connection of two wings of a window, door or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.03.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.1995Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gretsch-Unitas GmbH Baubeschläge
Johann-Maus-Strasse 3
71254 Ditzingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/45]For all designated states
Gretsch-Unitas GmbH Baubeschläge
Johann-Maus-Strasse 3
D-71254 Ditzingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Renz, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Brucknerstrasse 25
D-7257 Ditzingen / DE
02 / Röger, Wolfgang
Oppenheimerstrasse 25A
D-7000 Stuttgart 31 / DE
[1989/45]
Representative(s)Schmid, Berthold, et al
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/45]Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
D-70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date89105750.701.04.1989
[1989/45]
Priority number, dateDE19880005768U30.04.1988         Original published format: DE 8805768 U
[1989/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0340455
Date:08.11.1989
Language:DE
[1989/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0340455
Date:27.11.1991
Language:DE
[1991/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0340455
Date:26.04.1995
Language:DE
[1995/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:E05D7/04
[1989/45]
CPC:
E05D7/0415 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP); E05Y2900/148 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB [1989/45]
TitleGerman:Drehlager zur Verbindung zweier Flügel eines Fensters, einer Tür od. dgl.[1989/45]
English:Pivot bearing for the connection of two wings of a window, door or the like[1989/45]
French:Pivot pour la connexion de deux battants d'une fenêtre, d'une porte ou similaire[1989/45]
Examination procedure20.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/12]
04.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.1991Fee for grant paid
14.06.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.1992  19.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
 02  17.08.1992  01.09.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp
Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 10 16 16
D-44016 Dortmund / DE
 03  25.08.1992  01.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Roto Frank AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/11]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1992  19.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
 02  17.08.1992  01.09.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp
Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 10 16 16
D-44016 Dortmund / DE
 03  25.08.1992  01.10.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Roto Frank AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Former [1992/43]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1992   
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
 02  17.08.1992   
Hoesch AG
Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 10 16 16
D-44016 Dortmund / DE
 03  25.08.1992    ADMISSIBLE
Roto Frank AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Former [1992/41]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.1992    ADMISSIBLE
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Postfach 10 05 51
D-57005 Siegen / DE
 02  17.08.1992   
Hoesch AG
Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 10 16 16
D-44016 Dortmund / DE
22.10.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.1993Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
04.06.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.10.1993Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.11.1993Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.12.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.02.1995Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2456820  (GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0098257  (GERARD & DIDIER H ETS [BE]);
 [X]FR2548722  (TORDO CHARLES [FR]);
 [Y]EP0259618  (BROTSCHI & CO AG GEB [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.