EP0336328 - Apparatus for optically recording and reproducing information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON CONLUX CO., LTD. 2-2, Uchisaiwai-Cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states NIPPON CONLUX CO., LTD. 2-2, Uchisaiwai-Cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noda, Kazuo 4-15-5, Hirado Totsuka-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP | 02 /
Yamazaki, Koichi 20-11, Yanagi-Cho Sakado-Shi Saitama-Ken / JP | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89105784.6 | 02.04.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | JP19880082626 | 04.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8262688 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0336328 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0336328 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336328 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G11B7/00, G11B7/09 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/14 (EP,US);
G11B7/0033 (EP,US);
G11B7/0938 (EP,US);
G11B7/13 (EP,US);
G11B7/135 (EP,US);
G11B7/0901 (EP,US);
G11B7/0903 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/41] | G06K7/14, G06K1/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/41] | Title | German: | Gerät zur optischen Aufnahme und Wiedergabe von Information | [1989/41] | English: | Apparatus for optically recording and reproducing information | [1989/41] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction optique d'information | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5965948 ; | [A]JP6161236 ; | [A]JP57141032 ; | [X]FR2575568 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4633455 (HUDSON KENNETH C [US]); | [A]EP0261608 (CSK CORP [JP]); | [E]EP0313394 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0316959 (NIPPON CONLUX CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 171 (P-293)(1608) 08 August 1984, & JP-A-59 65948 (CANON K.K.) 14 April 1984,, & JP5965948 A 19840414 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 225 (P-484)(2281) 06 August 1986, & JP-A-61 61236 (HITACHI LTD) 29 March 1986,, & JP6161236 A 19860329 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 241 (P-158)(1119) 30 November 1982, & JP-A-57 141032 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 01 September 1982,, & JP57141032 A 19820901 |