EP0337353 - Vent type injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-11, Ginza 4-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states TOSHIBA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-11, Ginza 4-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumazaki, Hiroshi c/o Toshiba Kikai K.K. Numazu Jigyosho 2068-3, Ooka Numazu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Reichel, Wolfgang 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13 D-60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106319.0 | 10.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | JP19880088386 | 11.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8838688 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337353 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337353 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/63, B29C45/76 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
B29C45/76 (EP,US);
B29C45/63 (EP,US);
Y10S425/812 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/42] | B29C45/63 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1989/42] | Title | German: | Entgasungsspritzgiessmaschine | [1989/42] | English: | Vent type injection molding machine | [1989/42] | French: | Machine à mouler par injection du type à dégazage | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/05] | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.1989 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1989 | 08.06.1989 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1989 | 08.06.1989 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1989 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6089323 ; | [A]JP56136341 ; | [A]DE3727640 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2338779 (GKN WINDSOR GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3937778 (TANAKA SHOICHI) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 235 (M-415)[1958], 21st September 1985; & JP-A-60 89 323 (SUMITOMO JUKIKAI KOGYO K.K.) 20-05-1985, & JP6089323 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 17 (M-109)[895], 30th January 1982; & JP-A-56 136 341 (TOSHIBA KIKAI K.K.) 24-10-1981, & JP56136341 A 00000000 |