EP0345437 - Refrigerating apparatus with at least one compartment at even temperature and high relative humidity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIE ZANUSSI S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo 3 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1989/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scattolin, Mario via Trento 17 I-30037 Scorzè Venezia / IT | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89106334.9 | 10.04.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | IT19880045733 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: IT 4573388 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345437 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345437 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/08, F25D11/02 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F25D11/02 (EP);
F25D17/08 (EP);
F25D17/042 (EP);
F25D2317/0413 (EP);
F25D2317/0665 (EP);
F25D2317/067 (EP);
F25D2317/0671 (EP);
F25D2317/0672 (EP);
F25D2317/0682 (EP);
F25D2400/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Kältevorrichtung mit mindestens einer eine gleichmässige Temperatur und hohe relative Feuchtigkeit aufweisenden Kammer | [1989/50] | English: | Refrigerating apparatus with at least one compartment at even temperature and high relative humidity | [1989/50] | French: | Appareil frigorifique avec, au moins un compartiment à température uniforme et à haute humidité relative | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/34] | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB896723 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [Y]US4210000 (LEE DOO S [JP]); | [A]FR2580061 (ARMEL LOUIS [FR]) | [X] - REVUE PRATIQUE DU FROID, vol. 15, no. 191, February 1962; "L'entrepot frigorifique"pages 45-47 | [X] - KOELTECHNIEK, vol. 59, no. 7, July 1966; L. VAN PEL: "Jacketvriesopslagruimte voor bevroren vis"pages 140-142 |