EP0337359 - Lymphokine production and purification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1998/09] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1997/18] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1989/42] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Steven C. 122 Johnson Road Winchester Massachusetts 01890 / US | 02 /
Kaufman, Randal J. 111 Marlboro Street Boston Massachusetts 02116 / US | 03 /
Wong, Gordon G. 1137 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts 02138 / US | 04 /
Wang, Elisabeth A. 136 Wolf Rock Road Carlisle Massachusetts 017419 / US | [1989/42] | Application number, filing date | 89106339.8 | 04.07.1985 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | US19840628342 | 06.07.1984 Original published format: US 628342 | US19840652447 | 19.09.1984 Original published format: US 652447 | US19840652742 | 19.09.1984 Original published format: US 652742 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337359 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337359 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337359 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/27, C12P21/02, A61K38/17, C07K14/535 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
C12N15/85 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C07K14/535 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C12N2840/44 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/42] | C12N15/00, C12N5/00, C07H21/04, C12N1/20, C12N1/16, C12P21/02, A61K37/02, C07K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Lymphokin-Herstellung und -Reinigung | [1989/42] | English: | Lymphokine production and purification | [1989/42] | French: | Préparation et purification de lymphokines | [1989/42] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 10.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 06.12.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.03.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85903275.7 / EP0188479 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Request for further processing for: | 12.08.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.1996 | Decision despatched | 07.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 02.10.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2092159 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB); | [Y]EP0089062 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [Y]US4438032 (GOLDE DAVID W [US], et al); | [E]EP0183350 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) | [A] - NATURE, vol. 298, 1st July 1982, pages 75-77, Macmillan Journals Ltd; A.J. LUSIS et al.: "Translation of mRNA for human granulocyte-macrophage colony stimulating factor" | [A] - NATURE, vol. 309, 28th June 1984, pages 763-767; N.M. GOUGH et al.: "Molecular cloning of cDNA encoding a murine haematopoiectic growth regulator, granulocyte-macrophage colony stimulating factor" | [XP] - SCIENCE, vol. 228, no. 4701, 17th May 1985, pages 810-815, Washington, D.C., US; G.G. WONG et al.: "Human GM-CSF: molecular cloning of the complementary DNA and purification of the natural and recombinant proteins" | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 3, 22nd July 1985, page 452, no. 21037c, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.S. GREENBERGER et al.: "Molecularly cloned and expressed murine T-cell gene product is biologically similar to interleukin-3" & EXP. HEMATOL. (N.Y.) 1985, 13(4), 249-60 | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 82, no. 13, July 1985, pages 4360-4364, Washington, US; F. LEE et al.: "Isolation of cDNA for a human granulocyte-macrophage colony-stimulating factor by functional expression in mammalian cells" | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 82, January 1985, pages 292-296, Washington, US; L.G. SPARROW et al.: "Purification and partial amino acid sequence of asialo murine granulocyte-macrophage colony stimulating factor" | Examination | - URDAL ET AL., 3RD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HPLC OF PROTEINS, PEPTIDES AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES, pages 14 - 16 |