EP0341436 - Process and apparatus for cooling hot gas containing sticky or melting particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krupp Koppers GmbH Altendorfer Strasse 120 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states Krupp Koppers GmbH Altendorfer Strasse 120 D-45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jokisch, Friedrich, Dr. Ing. Theodor Suhnel Strasse 21 D-4330 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Linke, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bellenbergsteig 47b D-4300 Essen 16 / DE | 03 /
Pohl, Hans Christoph, Dr. Ing. Vormholzerstrasse 114 D-5810 Witten / DE | [1989/46] | Application number, filing date | 89106390.1 | 11.04.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | DE19883816340 | 13.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3816340 | [1989/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0341436 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0341436 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341436 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/04, C10J3/84, F28C3/02 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
C10K1/04 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,US);
C10K1/08 (EP,US);
Y10S48/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/46] | C10K1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kühlen eines heissen Produktgases, das klebrige bzw. schmelzflüssige Partikel enthält | [1989/46] | English: | Process and apparatus for cooling hot gas containing sticky or melting particles | [1989/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour refroidir un courant de gaz chaud contenant des particules collantes ou en fusion | [1989/46] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 12.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2526922 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [AD]DE3524802 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) |